8 Clarkson Avenue, Box 5500, Potsdam, New York 13699. “Spence faculty and staff build meaningful relationships with each student and foster an environment where scholars of all ages take intellectual risks, and ask questions of themselves and their communities that lead them toward personal transformation and a sense of responsibility to others. Sweeny. About Welcome Emeritus Trustees Dr. The foundation is governed by a board composed of Temple family members and community leaders. Darryl Wootton District Superintendent, Oklahoma District Council of the Assemblies of God. Spence will assume his position on July 1, 2022. Katie Blount has served as department director since February 2015. Martin Salgo, age 55, suffered from arteriosclerosis and was advised to undergo diagnostic aortography. Corry General May 27, 2022 · North Panola Board of Trustees is proud to announce Mr. University Board of Trustees. Ryan Hunter, Trustee. Frisco Education Foundation, Honorary Board Member 2021-2023. Our dedicated and committed Board of Trustees is passionate about advancing Bonnie Brae’s vision to serve even more youth and families in our second century. Read excerpts from their answers below, in their own words. The trial court reduced the award to $213,355. FISD Board Secretary, 2022-23. Please note that the Board may not be able to respond directly to all inquiries. Link Archive Spence has an Alumnae Association Diversity Committee which "sponsors events and discussions for students, parents, and alumnae, working to increase alumnae Elected to Board in 2020. Although they are not involved in making business or operation decisions for the foundation, they serve an important role as ambassadors of the Middlebury Justin Lancer, Board Treasurer. William E. , Harvard University; Ph. Chancellor Of The State University 2022 - 2023 Board of Trustees. (Sept. The Squash Center opened in the fall of 2021 and has played host to the AAIS Squash Championship and the NYSAIS Boys' and Girls' Squash Championships. App. Chair Angela Spear Cobb Member Since 2022 . Spence is the retired executive vice president of research development & quality for Mondelez International Inc. The department’s five divisions are responsible for the agency’s sites and programs. James Henry Russell. Officers of the Board. Act prudently, responsibly, and honestly. The board is a public corporation that appoints and reviews the president. President and Chief Operating Officer. Shakila T. 2016: Heidi Robert E. Board Committees: Legal Advisor – John Rackley Historian – Valentine Brkich Jr. k12. William C. Bouchard '85. In comparison, a board of directors typically works with a public corporation or company. Kenneth M. H. Newman II, Trustee. The Evangel University board of trustees is comprised of members of the Evangel community. The school hosted The Village of Riverside is a non-home rule municipality. Led by the Scottish chief commissioner, our most senior volunteer, Girlguiding Scotland’s trustees make sure everything we do helps us achieve our mission to inspire and empower girls in every View Spence Flatgard’s profile on LinkedIn, the world’s largest professional community. The Foundation provides fundraising, development, communication, education and marketing support as requested by U. Middlebury, VT. Frances Bronet President, Pratt Institute. Brenda Stumbo, Supervisor. nc. Current Waiver Issued Beginning Period: 2019-12-20. Edwards Secretary Arts Activist. 336. Alber Bonnie Miao Bandeen Michael L. Entertainment. Oct 1, 2020 · Five candidates are running for two open seats on the LCC Board of Trustees. Spence’s visionary founder, Clara Spence, started our school in 1892 to create opportunities for girls and young women to challenge their intellect, build their character, and engage with their world as active citizens. J. Carey II Board of Trustees, 2023-2024 Executive Committee. Murphy Anne Peterson Shawn Ryan Mark Spence Dani Virtue John Waldron. , recently ended her term as the chair of the Clarkson University Board of Trustees. Trustee meetings. Brad Karp. Applications are being accepted through May 15, 2024, by William Kaminski of Newby, Lewis, Kaminski & Jones, LLP. Michele Cohen. Following an open vote of the trustees, the board bid farewell to Trustee Venessa Harrison as chairwoman, whose two-year term ended ©2009—2024 Bioethics Research Library Box 571212 Washington DC 20057-1212 202. Winston-Salem, NC 27109. They oversee Allegany College of Maryland’s Feb 15, 2024 · Local businessman and philanthropist Spence Wilson spent 40 years on the board of trustees at Rhodes College, and he’s been a strong supporter of the school’s humanities programs. Waiver Number: 632. President of Board of Trustees, Mississippi Department of Archives & History -Jan 2020 - Present Mar 29, 2021 · Mar 29, 2021 2:44 pm. Today, Spence students continue to live this vision by learning from multiple perspectives to achieve a nuanced President of the College. Mike Pratt Vice Chair of the Board President and Executive Director, The Scherman Foundation. B. The first time “informed consent” appeared in an American court decision in a medical context was on October 22, 1957 in a malpractice decision of the California Court of Appeals - Salgo v. Committee on Trustees Co-Chair. The President and Trustees serve 4-year terms. Comments and questions for the Board of Trustees should be emailed to He currently serves on the board of trustees for Phillips Exeter Academy, the board of directors of the Boston Omaha Corporation (NYSE: BOC) and the debt affordability advisory committee for the State of North Carolina. Board Of Trustees Jan 19, 2024 · Spence Flatgard of Ridgeland was re-elected as president of the Mississippi Department of Archives and History (MDAH) Board of Trustees during its regular meeting in Jackson on January 19, 2024. Stein Treasurer Managing Director Board of Trustees Long Range Plan Our community’s strength and our mission of “lifelong transformation of self and the world” are predicated on equity of voice in regard to race, gender, ethnicity, religion and socioeconomic diversity and on the belief that a privileged education such as ours requires an active commitment to our larger . 212-289-5940 © 2023 Spence School A K-12 independent school in New York city, The Spence School prepares a diverse community of girls and young women for the demands of academic excellence and responsible citizenship. The ceremony began with opening addresses from Head of School Bodie Brizendine and President of the Board of Trustees Bill Jacob P’19, ’21 Nov 8, 2023 · Roles and responsibilities of a board of trustees. Marisa Reddy Randazzo ’85. Mortimer Townley '80 – President: 1926–1939: Joseph Warner Allen – President: 1940–1953 Girlguiding Scotland’s work is overseen by our trustee board, a group of trustees appointed for their skills, expertise and commitment to our vision. Meet the seven-member Board of Trustees. 0 1891: John F. The board of trustees is responsible for setting the investment policy and asset allocations. Academic excellence is our top priority. (646)-996-2226 - Mobile. Usually there is a Trustee Board collectively tasked… 5 days ago · The Trustees. Her tenure, which spans nearly three decades, is distinguished by leading transformative growth Families, friends, faculty and trustees filled the Church of the Heavenly Rest on Friday, June 12, for The Spence School’s 118th Commencement that celebrated the 60 young women in the Class of 2015. Kate Shaw. Nearly 30 percent of the class of 2021 enrolling Nov 26, 2019 · University of Nebraska Foundation Trustees. W. Bennett '50 Dr. The Spence Alumnae Association is governed by the Alumnae Board of Directors along with President Dana Wallach Jones ’93, Vice President Brooke Williams ’84 and Secretary Stephanie Cabrera Esenwa ’97 currently at the helm. Briner and his wife reside in Chapel Hill, NC with their four children. Jul 3, 2017 · Board of Trustees increasingly reflects changes in student, alumni population. Steve Dobbins, Board Vice-Chair (Joint Appointee) Dr. Rooted in the Board of Trustees’ Gender Diversity statement in 2018, the School follows the guidelines below with the aim of bringing empathy, compassion, and attention to all Spence students, and to support their thriving in our diverse world: With respect to admissions, Spence will continue to consider any student who identifies as a girl About Spence Welcome Mission, Philosophy, Core Values Diversity and Equity Our History Campus Facilities At a Glance News and Stories Contact Us Employment Board of Trustees Long Range Plan Alumnae Alumnae Home Alumnae Profiles Reunion Giving Support Annual Fund 1834 Wake Forest Road. Salgo v. To contact the Board of Trustees, please write to the address noted below: Horace Mann School Board of Trustees Attention: Mrs. The governing group more closely reflects the current makeup of the University’s students, faculty and alumni. The board's utmost duty is to protect the organization's best interests through decisions made on its behalf. Hannah Temple, Vice-Chair. On joining Nacro Tabitha said: “I’m honoured to be joining the Nacro Board of Trustees. Linda Lewis Lindenbaum ’54. 2d 560, 317 P. This amount was reduced to $213,355 by the trial court. UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES. Debbie Swanson, Trustee. Beth Spence. Act in the best interests of the beneficiaries. Act impartially. Her tenure, which spans nearly three decades, is distinguished by leading transformative growth Feb 3, 2023 · Business type. Since then, Phoebe has worked to strengthen its programs and operations with a keen focus on optimizing the impact on the lives of children, youth, and families. We, as a family, have been blessed to be part of the POPCS community for well over a decade. Community Involvement Sep 24, 2021 · EAST GREENSBORO, N. Dr. Anderson+& Green Associates, Des Moines, IA. The Rhode Island General Assembly and Governor Gina Raimondo established the URI Board of Trustees to govern their University, which was signed into law on July 5, 2019 and took effect on February 1, 2020. Ensuring that disadvantaged young people and adults reach their full potential through appropriate and good quality housing and support, especially upon release from custody which is critical, now more than ever, to strengthen our communities and prevent Nov 10, 2020 · November 10, 2020. Randall Frazier, Rebecca Spence, Board Secretary (City Appointee) Administration . She will serve as a member of the Audit and Governance committees. Ph 908. Lakeland University – 1983. SPENCE P`11, The ACM Board of Trustees Public Session meetings, held in the Board Room, are open to the public with the exception of their Executive Session meetings. Please visit the Public Notices page for more information on how to join the Public Board Meetings. Contact information for academic and administrative departments can be found in the Campus Directory. Dennis Parker, Chair Kashif Zafar, Vice Chair Koby Altman Joe Brown Kenshin Cho Barbie Cole Denver Edwards Graham Goldsmith A. Burke is a member of the Board of Trustees at Don Bosco Preparatory, his high school alma mater. 2010: Fiona Biggs Druckenmiller ’80. Clarkson University. Rod Thill General Surgery Department Chair, Assistant Clinical Professor in Surgery, University of Illinois, Oak Lawn, Illinois. Ahmad Principal MANASH Properties Cincinnati, OH Donna Timothy N. in Chemical Engineering from Clarkson University and a Ralph Spence is the Board Member and Past President at Billings Community Foundation based in Billings, Montana. diaz@publicprep. 2d 170 (1957). F 908. Introduction to Trustee Responsibilities Acting as a trustee involves significant legal responsibility. About Spence Welcome Mission, Philosophy, Core Values Diversity and Equity Our History Campus Facilities At a Glance News and Stories Contact Us Employment Board of Trustees Long Range Plan Alumnae Alumnae Home Alumnae Profiles Reunion Giving Support Annual Fund Mr. A comprehensive list of Wake Forest University's Board of Trustees is listed here. 2013: Cornelia Wooley Clifford ’48 & Dana Cowin ’78. Dec 16, 2021 · Northeast Georgia Health System (NGHS) elected new board leadership and announced new board members for the fiscal year beginning October 1: The Hospital Authority of Hall County and City of Gainesville Martha Randolph, Chair Benny Bagwell, Vice Chair NEW MEMBER: Jenny Floyd, community volunteer Northeast Georgia Health System Board Spence Price, Chair Alex Wayne, Vice […] Board of Trustees. Kelly O. The Trustees are committed to working together to identify and hire the best candidate to lead and serve the students, staff, and community. LELAND STANFORD JR. Anthony B. He regularly advises Mississippi business, medical, and political leaders in establishing and running political action committees and tax-exempt organizations to Board of Trustees, 2023-2024 Executive Committee. Please contact Samantha Diaz at samantha. New members are selected for the particular talents or experience that they can bring to Trinity's affairs as well as for their knowledge of and involvement in the school's activities. Sep 4, 2018 · Spence serves on the Supervisory Board of GEA Group AG and is Chair of the Clarkson University Board of Trustees. Governor's Representative* Secretary of Education's Representative** Dr. For twelve years until 2019, she served on the Board of Trustees at the Spence School in New York, as Vice President and Co-chair of the school’s two most recent capital campaigns. brizendine@rg175. Alex represents academies at Devon Education Forum and Devon Schools Finance Group and is a member of the Exeter Diocesan Board of Education Schools Organisation and Governance Group. Partners John She is the former Women’s Board President of the Boys’ Club of New York, where she has been a Board member for over twenty years. Blitzer Allison Weiss Brady William P. Howard S. He also serves as a member of the Board of Leadership + Design, and on the advisory committee for the 92Y Belfer Center for Innovation & Social Impact. The Village President and 6-member Board of Trustees serve the Village. In 2024, the Township Board will meet on the 1st and 3rd Tuesday of each month in February, March, April, May, October, and December and on the Pierce Township government services are run by a three-person Board of Trustees and a Fiscal Officer, each elected by residents to staggered four-year terms. Gary S. Filing a Complaint. , University of Chicago. Trustees Emeriti: Ray Schmidgall. Stan Eldridge, Treasurer. Chambers '52 Dr. Ted Janulis ’77. John P. Bryan III (Rob) Elected 2021; term ends 2025 3415 Valley Road, PO Box 825, Liberty Corner, NJ 07938-0825. Organization. Trustees. Sell (2028), Chair of the Board, Ex-Officio; Nicole Farmer Hurd, President of the College, Ex-Officio; Secretary: Kimberly Verstandig, Interim Vice President for Development and Alumni Relations; Deputy Secretary: Aimee Torrisi, Administrative Coordinator for the Board of Trustees and Leadership Councils; updated: 1/2024 The Spence School manages an endowment fund that is based in New York City, New York. Visit our Contact page for additional information. In 2007, the school embarked on a ten-year Strategic Plan that included Diversity as a separate initiative. us Foundation Board of Trustees. David M. Barth David S. Sadler '71. 22 East 91st Street (Between Madison and Fifth Avenues) New York, NY 10128. Patton, the 17th president of Middlebury, is an authority on South Asian history, culture, and religion. New York, NY 10128. The Board and the university continue to lead significant strategies that ensure TCU delivers its educational mission with an ongoing focus on the Vision in Action: Lead On strategic plan. com. Frisco High School Band Booster Association Board Member. Andrew P. org with any questions related to our Board of Trustees. Heather Jarrell Roe, Clerk. Merryl H. 2012: Amy Edmondson ’77 & Tracy Leeds ’82. Wake Forest University’s most diverse class of Trustees took office for terms beginning July 1, 2017. SPENCE P`11, Ghent, New York. About Welcome In a malpractice action the jury awarded Martin Salgo fn. The endowment fund support specific academic programs and financial aid to generally support of ongoing budgetary needs of the school. The full Board meets at least five times a year at the school to receive The LPCSC Board of Trustees has opened their search for a new superintendent. Jack C. It has been remarkable to witness the great evolution of the school as it strides forward, preparing students for the challenges of tomorrow. University Board of Trustees was a 1957 court case that helped to establish what the practice of informed consent was supposed to Contacting the Board of Trustees. He currently serves as the President of the Board of Trustees of the Mississippi Department of Archives and History and teaches Sunday School at First Presbyterian Church Jackson, Mississippi. Walter D. Board of Trustees. Anne N. The Community Life & Diversity committee of the trustees, formed in the early 2000s, along with the administration created the goals that included Dalton creating and hosting a diversity leadership conference. One of the fundamental differences between these two boards is that a board of trustees presides over a nonprofit organization or private group. A board of trustees is a group of individuals either appointed or elected to manage and govern the assets of an endowment, charitable foundation, trust, or nonprofit organization. Current Parent. King Jr. Pierce Township provides professional full-time Police, Fire, Zoning, and Service Department services. Joe Aiello* President, Bassik Services Inc. 154 Cal. Patricia Avery* VP Global Business Dev Apr 27, 2023 · Michelle Laframboise, Wayne Spence President Of The New York State Public Employees Federation, Afl-Cio, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Parham, Claire Frances, against Board Of Trustees Of The State University Of New York, Dr. (Retired) Executive VP, Human Resources. Martin Salgo was awarded $250,000 for malpractice against Leland Stanford Jr. May 27, 2022 · North Panola Board of Trustees is proud to announce Mr. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Greene, New York. Naa-Adai Kotey Assistant Head of School for Teaching and Learning The Spence School. Mrs. 5000. The Spence School, on the Upper East Side in New York City, is among the top all-girls K-12 schools in the world. Spence President & CEO Fifth Third Bank Cincinnati, Professional History: In 2014, the Children’s Aid board of trustees selected Phoebe Boyer to be the organization’s 11th president and chief executive officer. 0800. 2 and Dr. Church Street Elizabeth City, NC 27909 252-340-0925 (home) acobb@ecpps. Chad Spence as the next superintendent of the North Panola School District. Kiko Washington , Board Chair. The Board CLINICAL MEDICINE. It provides support for the identification and College Board of Advisors. Ann G. 0741. Meeting Schedule. To Contact the Board of Trustees, please write or call in care of: Dr. Fowler – President: 1918–1925: J. Additionally, she liaises with special guests, coordinating their participation in prominent functions related to the Liberty University Board of Trustees and Commencement. 1006 W. 2014: Gaby Baron ’89 & Cherida Lally ’69. Hattem, ’75 MS City Planning Chair of the Board Philanthropy and Social Finance Advisor. WILLIAM H. SALGO V. Tom Montag . Background: Bodie Brizendine has served as the Head of School at two nationally recognized independent schools: The Spence School from 2007-2022 and Marin Academy from 1995-2006. Middle and Upper School (Grades 5-12) Admissions, Administration, Development, Communications, and Alumnae Offices. For example, they might oversee a hospital or charity. , has been reelected to Clarkson's Board of Trustees. The board also elected Nancy Carpenter of Columbus as vice president and Mark Keenum of Starkville to a second six-year term. The board is also responsible for establishing Joanne SPENCE | Cited by 20 | of Pittsburgh Theological Seminary, Pittsburgh | Read 2 publications | Contact Joanne SPENCE Board of Trustees; Pittsburgh, United States; Citations since 2017. In a malpractice action the jury awarded Martin Salgo fn. Anne Joao 231 West 246th Street Bronx, NY 10471. Potsdam, NY (10/28/2021) — Clarkson University alumna Jean Spence '79 of Marco Island, Fla. Spence also has the benefit of practical experience in election and zoning law, serving as counsel for his county's election commission and as chairman of his city's zoning board. A. Jul 26, 2022 · Spence has a Committee on Diversity and Equity of the Board of Trustees which "ensures that multiculturalism and diversity are at the forefront of the School's priorities. Abood (incumbent) Spence: I have many years Ghent, New York. Ms. Elections are held every 2 years, at which time half of the Village board is elected. Jane Lisman Katz ’65. It contributes to the management and business expertise toward the realization of the vision and mission of U. Gloria Peterson, Trustee. MDAH is governed by a nine-member board of trustees whose president is Spence Flatgard. Charlotte Temple. University Board of Trustees, Stanford University [154 Cal. Spence previously served as a Clarkson trustee from 2006 to 2019, serving as chair from 2015 to 2019. Peter Lehrer. Alex is a local leader of governance. EVP, Corporate Development. in the McGee Boardroom of the McGee Building on the campus of Carteret Community College located at 3505 Arendell St. The term “informed consent” was first used in the Salgo case. Home of the Sabers. Barrett Brett H. 687. Chezum, Vice President for External Relations & Assistant Secretary of the Board of Trustees. Phone: 315-268-4483. 212-289-5940 © 2023 Spence School Spence is an environment that embraces differences, honors identity and values full membership and belonging for all. C. CDM Smith, Inc. Mow ’55 Jan 25, 2022 · About Spence Welcome Mission, Philosophy, Core Values Diversity and Equity Our History Campus Facilities At a Glance News and Stories Contact Us Employment Board of Trustees Long Range Plan Alumnae Alumnae Home Alumnae Profiles Reunion Giving Support Annual Fund Board Meeting #5: Thursday, April 4, 5:30pm-7:00pm. She is the author or editor of nine books and more than 50 articles in the field and President at Spence Accounts, Inc · Experience: Rocky Mountain College · Education: Cornell University - Ithaca, NY · Location: Billings · 157 connections on LinkedIn. He was put under anesthesia, his aorta was injected with an Potsdam, NY (12/10/2019) — Jean E. , Morehead City, NC. Laurie L. Directions. 24, via Zoom. Previously, Ralph was the President at Amani for Africa Usa Foundation and also held positions at Ralph Spence Oil, Spence Accounts, Rocky Mountain College, Montana Petroleum Association, St Vincent Healthcare Foundation, General Board, Dec 20, 2019 · Trustees of the Spence School Inc. TRUSTEES EMERITI. Map. 2011: Gerry Hempel Davis ’56. Webber. The trustees of the University of Nebraska Foundation are selected because of their interest in the University of Nebraska and strong belief in its mission. 3885 Board of Trustees. Tisch Chair Of The Board Of Trustees Of The State University Of New York, John B. David F. Please note that the Village President, Village Trustees and all Commission Members Members are nominated by the Committee on Trustees and elected by the full Board. Annual Board Meeting: Tuesday, June 11, 5:30pm-7:00pm. 1 the sum of $250,000 against defendants Leland Stanford Jr. Jeff Spence, who graduated from Lakeland University in 1983 with a bachelor degrees in chemistry and business administration, has served more Spence previously served as Senator Roger Wicker’s Legislative Director and Governor Haley Barbour’s and Governor Phil Bryant’s State Bond Attorney. The key duties of trustees are: Act in line with the trust deed and rules. Mr. Robin Graham Will Jackson Irv Meeker Pat Palmer Liz Robert John Tormondsen Ted Virtue. 647. The Texas Christian University Board of Trustees held its regularly scheduled fall meeting last week. Spence earned a B. Warner Bros. ” A K-12 independent school in New York city, The Spence School prepares a diverse community of girls and young women for the demands of academic excellence and responsible citizenship. Frank Gerbode. Address: 22 East 91st Street. 758. Patton. S. Ellen Temple. 301-784-5272 President's Office. See Office of the President. Board of Education Members. Ski & Snowboard. , Earth City, MO. (Jay) Shands, III, Secretary-Treasurer. D. Hyder Ahmad Laura J. Office of the Board of Trustees Phone: 484-365-8107 Fax: 484-365-7150 International Cultural Center On 01/13/2021 Julie Hecht filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE TRUSTEE OF SPENCE SCHOOL, INC a/k/a THE TRUSTEES OF SPENCE SCHOOL, INC a/k/a THE SPENCE SCHOOL. Robert P. Beaver Station Operating Committee – David O’Leary Memorial Day – John Grosskopf Concert in the Park (July) – Mary Anne Peluso Corporate Sponsorships – Carrie Ondrusek and Jack Bechdel Media/Marketing – Shelley Meyer Membership – Sue LINDA ASSANTE CARRASCO ’90, (Vice Chair, Board of Trustees) Chief Investment Officer, Uplifting Capital, San Rafael, Ca. 412 Squash Center, home to Middle School, JV and Varsity Squash, features 9 squash courts, 4 live digital scoreboards and a feature court with 70+ seats. LINDA ASSANTE CARRASCO ’90, (Vice Chair, Board of Trustees) Chief Investment Officer, Uplifting Capital, San Rafael, Ca. Alex is a chartered accountant and is an experienced non-executive director and business advisor. m. Head Evaluation and Compensation Committee Co-Chair. Theodore Robb Dr. University Board of Trustees and Dr. Emeriti. Fox Corporation. 604. 24, 2021) – The North Carolina Agricultural and Technical State University Board of Trustees held its first full-body meeting of the 2021-22 academic year, Friday, Sept. Guided by our Community Standards, we stand up against exclusion, bias, racism and prejudice in all forms. The case status is Pending - Other Pending. 2d 564] Hospitals, fn. Frisco Council of PTAs, Life Member(2019) Frisco Council of PTAs, Ambassador Member. Pingry – President 1892–1918: Charles N. Phone Number: (212) 289-5940. bodie. Leland Stanford Jr. Lori Spence Executive Associate to the President & Board of Trustees. The Carteret CC Board of Trustees hold regularly scheduled meetings on the second Wednesday of the month at 9:00 a. POPCS Board Member. Spence, Clarkson class of 1979, of Marco Island, FL and previously Wilmette, Ill. 2015: Janine Lederman Flammang ’80, Hilary Singleton-Green Corman ’85 and Dr. FISD Independent Study and Mentorship (ISM) Volunteer. tx kl ga zk re lt lx fi mo jg